Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 602 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3528 Week
» 5266 Month
» 132709 Year
» 1798085 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/E69
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 12/1910
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class D15

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1790   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 02/1911 01/01/1957  
1791   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 03/1911 23/09/1948  
1792   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 03/1911 03/09/1951  
1793   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 04/1911 05/02/1960  
1794   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 05/1911 06/06/1957  
1795   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 07/1911 28/09/1959  
1796   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 07/1911 28/11/1955  
1797   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 07/1911 01/01/1957  
1798   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 08/1911 04/02/1957  
1799   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 08/1911 01/01/1959