Manufacturer: Stratford Works
Builder | Stratford Works |
Order Date | 12/1910 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | D15 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1790 | D15 | GER | Holden | 4-4-0 | 02/1911 | 01/01/1957 | ||
1791 | D15 | GER | Holden | 4-4-0 | 03/1911 | 23/09/1948 | ||
1792 | D15 | GER | Holden | 4-4-0 | 03/1911 | 03/09/1951 | ||
1793 | D15 | GER | Holden | 4-4-0 | 04/1911 | 05/02/1960 | ||
1794 | D15 | GER | Holden | 4-4-0 | 05/1911 | 06/06/1957 | ||
1795 | D15 | GER | Holden | 4-4-0 | 07/1911 | 28/09/1959 | ||
1796 | D15 | GER | Holden | 4-4-0 | 07/1911 | 28/11/1955 | ||
1797 | D15 | GER | Holden | 4-4-0 | 07/1911 | 01/01/1957 | ||
1798 | D15 | GER | Holden | 4-4-0 | 08/1911 | 04/02/1957 | ||
1799 | D15 | GER | Holden | 4-4-0 | 08/1911 | 01/01/1959 |