Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 601 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3527 Week
» 5265 Month
» 132708 Year
» 1798084 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/E72
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 1912
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class J18

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1240   J18 LNER   0-6-0 11/1912 26/11/1959  
1241   J18 LNER   0-6-0 11/1912 25/01/1960  
1242   J18 LNER   0-6-0 11/1912 30/03/1960  
1243   J18 LNER   0-6-0 11/1912 23/11/1961  
1244   J18 LNER   0-6-0 11/1912 27/07/1959  
1245   J18 LNER   0-6-0 11/1912 12/12/1958  
1246   J18 LNER   0-6-0 11/1912 26/10/1961  
1247   J18 LNER   0-6-0 12/1912 30/03/1960  
1248   J18 LNER   0-6-0 12/1912 11/08/1959  
1249   J18 LNER   0-6-0 01/1913 01/01/1959