Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 564 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3490 Week
» 5228 Month
» 132671 Year
» 1798047 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/E75
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 02/1913
For 5 Steam locomotives
Class B12

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1515   B12 GER Holden 4-6-0 11/1913 12/11/1951  
1516   B12 GER Holden 4-6-0 11/1913 14/07/1958  
1517   B12 GER Holden 4-6-0 11/1913 21/10/1948  
1518   B12 GER Holden 4-6-0 12/1913 12/1947  
1519   B12 GER Holden 4-6-0 12/1913 23/12/1957