Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 543 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3469 Week
» 5207 Month
» 132650 Year
» 1798026 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/F36
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 08/1895
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class J67
Information Passenger

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
377   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 10/1895 20/12/1958  
378   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 10/1895 25/07/1961  
379   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 10/1895 05/05/1958  
380   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 10/1895 16/09/1962  
381   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 10/1895 20/10/1959  
382   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 11/1895 13/01/1961  
383   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 11/1895 04/1956  
384   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 11/1895 10/01/1961  
385   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 11/1895 14/07/1958  
386   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 12/1895 15/08/1956