Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 590 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3516 Week
» 5254 Month
» 132697 Year
» 1798073 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/F53
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 01/1902
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class D14

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1870   D14 GER Holden 4-4-0 03/1902 10/02/1958  
1871   D14 GER Holden 4-4-0 03/1902 04/08/1958  
1872   D14 GER Holden 4-4-0 03/1902 27/08/1956  
1873   D14 GER Holden 4-4-0 03/1902 10/03/1960  
1874   D14 GER Holden 4-4-0 03/1902 19/09/1955  
1875   D14 GER Holden 4-4-0 04/1902 21/05/1957  
1876   D14 GER Holden 4-4-0 04/1902 07/07/1952  
1877   D14 GER Holden 4-4-0 04/1902 25/06/1951  
1878   D14 GER Holden 4-4-0 05/1902 23/11/1959  
1879   D14 GER Holden 4-4-0 05/1902 22/09/1958