Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 27 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4654 Week
» 6392 Month
» 133835 Year
» 1799211 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/G47
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 10/1899
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class J67
Information Shunting

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
199   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 12/1899 07/1937  
200   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 12/1899 07/03/1955  
201   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 12/1899 07/1937  
202   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 12/1899 07/1937  
203   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 12/1899 04/01/1960  
204   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 12/1899 28/07/1955  
205   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 12/1899 05/1937  
206   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 12/1899 20/01/1958  
207   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 01/1900 18/11/1955  
208   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 01/1900 12/01/1957