Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 27 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4654 Week
» 6392 Month
» 133835 Year
» 1799211 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/G58
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 02/1905
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class J17

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1210   J17 GER Holden 0-6-0 04/1905 05/06/1962  
1211   J17 GER Holden 0-6-0 04/1905 07/12/1959  
1212   J17 GER Holden 0-6-0 04/1905 25/08/1958  
1213   J17 GER Holden 0-6-0 05/1905 01/01/1960  
1214   J17 GER Holden 0-6-0 05/1905 17/08/1960  
1215   J17 GER Holden 0-6-0 05/1905 05/04/1960  
1216   J17 GER Holden 0-6-0 05/1905 04/07/1960  
1217   J17 GER Holden 0-6-0 05/1905 06/08/1962  
1218   J17 GER Holden 0-6-0 05/1905 22/09/1958  
1219   J17 GER Holden 0-6-0 06/1905 21/02/1955