Manufacturer: Stratford Works
Builder | Stratford Works |
Order Date | 02/1905 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | J17 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1210 | J17 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0 | 04/1905 | 05/06/1962 | ||
1211 | J17 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0 | 04/1905 | 07/12/1959 | ||
1212 | J17 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0 | 04/1905 | 25/08/1958 | ||
1213 | J17 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0 | 05/1905 | 01/01/1960 | ||
1214 | J17 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0 | 05/1905 | 17/08/1960 | ||
1215 | J17 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0 | 05/1905 | 05/04/1960 | ||
1216 | J17 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0 | 05/1905 | 04/07/1960 | ||
1217 | J17 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0 | 05/1905 | 06/08/1962 | ||
1218 | J17 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0 | 05/1905 | 22/09/1958 | ||
1219 | J17 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0 | 06/1905 | 21/02/1955 |