Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 23 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4650 Week
» 6388 Month
» 133831 Year
» 1799207 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/G61
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 09/1906
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class D15

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1840   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 11/1906 16/07/1956  
1841   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 11/1906 25/10/1955  
1842   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 11/1906 01/01/1957  
1843   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 11/1906 28/11/1955  
1844   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 11/1906 24/03/1958  
1845   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 11/1906 01/01/1957  
1846   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 12/1906 31/10/1955  
1847   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 12/1906 06/05/1957  
1848   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 01/1907 12/12/1955  
1849   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 01/1907 24/09/1948