Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 21 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4648 Week
» 6386 Month
» 133829 Year
» 1799205 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/G69
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 1911
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class F6

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
61   F6 GER Holden 2-4-2T 04/1911 25/07/1955  
62   F6 GER Holden 2-4-2T 04/1911 31/10/1957  
63   F6 GER Holden 2-4-2T 04/1911 17/08/1955  
64   F6 GER Holden 2-4-2T 05/1911 13/12/1955  
65   F6 GER Holden 2-4-2T 05/1911 19/11/1956  
66   F6 GER Holden 2-4-2T 05/1911 28/05/1956  
67   F6 GER Holden 2-4-2T 05/1911 14/11/1955  
68   F6 GER Holden 2-4-2T 05/1911 08/05/1958  
69   F6 GER Holden 2-4-2T 06/1911 21/04/1958  
70   F6 GER Holden 2-4-2T 06/1911 18/03/1958