Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 604 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3530 Week
» 5268 Month
» 132711 Year
» 1798087 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/G73
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 1913
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class J15

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
542   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 06/1913 07/12/1959  
543   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 06/1913 17/06/1960  
544   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 06/1913 05/12/1959  
545   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 06/1913 17/03/1960  
546   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 07/1913 08/02/1960  
547   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 08/1913 01/09/1959  
548   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 08/1913 05/09/1962  
549   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 08/1913 08/02/1960  
550   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 09/1913 26/10/1961  
551   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 09/1913 15/08/1960