Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 583 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3509 Week
» 5247 Month
» 132690 Year
» 1798066 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/H45
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 01/1899
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class J67
Information Shunting

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
255   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 03/1899 05/1937  
256   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 03/1899 26/04/1958  
257   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 03/1899 13/08/1955  
258   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 03/1899 06/1958  
259   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 03/1899 05/1937  
260   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 03/1899 21/05/1956  
261   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 04/1899 01/10/1959  
262   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 04/1899 01/05/1958  
263   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 04/1899 30/01/1956  
264   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 04/1899 29/09/1955