Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 27 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4654 Week
» 6392 Month
» 133835 Year
» 1799211 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/H50
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 09/1900
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class J16

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1160   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 11/1900 21/03/1955  
1161   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 11/1900 28/11/1960  
1162   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 11/1900 07/12/1959  
1163   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 11/1900 21/03/1961  
1164   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 12/1900 04/01/1960  
1165   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 01/1901 15/09/1958  
1166   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 01/1901 07/03/1955  
1167   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 01/1901 09/05/1955  
1168   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 01/1901 17/09/1958  
1169   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 02/1901 10/03/1960