Manufacturer: Stratford Works
Builder | Stratford Works |
Order Date | 09/1900 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | J16 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1160 | J16 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0 | 11/1900 | 21/03/1955 | ||
1161 | J16 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0 | 11/1900 | 28/11/1960 | ||
1162 | J16 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0 | 11/1900 | 07/12/1959 | ||
1163 | J16 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0 | 11/1900 | 21/03/1961 | ||
1164 | J16 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0 | 12/1900 | 04/01/1960 | ||
1165 | J16 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0 | 01/1901 | 15/09/1958 | ||
1166 | J16 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0 | 01/1901 | 07/03/1955 | ||
1167 | J16 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0 | 01/1901 | 09/05/1955 | ||
1168 | J16 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0 | 01/1901 | 17/09/1958 | ||
1169 | J16 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0 | 02/1901 | 10/03/1960 |