Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 627 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 6158 Week
» 30992 Month
» 65324 Year
» 1730700 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/H63
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 1907
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class F4

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
111   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 11/1907 24/04/1948  
221   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 11/1907 06/1934  
222   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 11/1907 27/08/1951  
223   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 11/1907 02/1935  
224   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 11/1907 02/1935  
225   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 11/1907 05/1935  
232   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 11/1907 15/01/1951  
233   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 12/1907 09/04/1951  
234   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 12/1907 04/1933  
235   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 12/1907 06/1935