Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 30 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4657 Week
» 6395 Month
» 133838 Year
» 1799214 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/H80
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 1917
For 5 Steam locomotives
Class J19

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1260   J19 GER Hill 0-6-0 12/1917 29/08/1960  
1261   J19 GER Hill 0-6-0 12/1917 24/08/1959  
1262   J19 GER Hill 0-6-0 01/1918 19/01/1959  
1263   J19 GER Hill 0-6-0 03/1918 11/10/1960  
1264   J19 GER Hill 0-6-0 09/1918 16/09/1962