Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 590 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3516 Week
» 5254 Month
» 132697 Year
» 1798073 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/I45
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 1899
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class J15

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
507   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 05/1899 01/1935  
508   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 05/1899 08/1949  
509   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 05/1899 25/11/1950  
510   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 05/1899 02/01/1956  
511   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 05/1899 05/03/1951  
512   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 05/1899 10/03/1958  
513   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 05/1899 08/1920  
514   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 05/1899 08/02/1958  
515   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 06/1899 16/11/1959  
516   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 06/1899 15/10/1956