Manufacturer: Stratford Works
Builder | Stratford Works |
Order Date | 1899 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | J15 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
507 | J15 | GER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 05/1899 | 01/1935 | ||
508 | J15 | GER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 05/1899 | 08/1949 | ||
509 | J15 | GER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 05/1899 | 25/11/1950 | ||
510 | J15 | GER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 05/1899 | 02/01/1956 | ||
511 | J15 | GER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 05/1899 | 05/03/1951 | ||
512 | J15 | GER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 05/1899 | 10/03/1958 | ||
513 | J15 | GER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 05/1899 | 08/1920 | ||
514 | J15 | GER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 05/1899 | 08/02/1958 | ||
515 | J15 | GER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 06/1899 | 16/11/1959 | ||
516 | J15 | GER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 06/1899 | 15/10/1956 |