Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 599 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3525 Week
» 5263 Month
» 132706 Year
» 1798082 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/I65
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 1909
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class F4

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
71   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 03/1909 24/04/1948  
72   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 03/1909 24/04/1948  
73   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 03/1909 03/1935  
74   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 03/1909 12/01/1953  
75   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 04/1909 04/1950  
76   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 04/1909 08/12/1952  
77   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 04/1909 24/04/1948  
78   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 04/1909 22/07/1953  
79   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 05/1909 18/08/1955  
80   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 05/1909 02/1936