Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 549 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3475 Week
» 5213 Month
» 132656 Year
» 1798032 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/I89
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 08/1923
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class J68
Information Shunters

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
31E   J68 GER Hill 0-6-0T 10/1923 18/08/1958  
32E   J68 GER Hill 0-6-0T 10/1923 17/04/1959  
33E   J68 GER Hill 0-6-0T 10/1923 18/08/1958  
34E   J68 GER Hill 0-6-0T 10/1923 04/12/1960  
35E   J68 GER Hill 0-6-0T 10/1923 18/12/1959  
36E   J68 GER Hill 0-6-0T 11/1923 18/08/1958  
37E   J68 GER Hill 0-6-0T 11/1923 11/10/1960  
38E   J68 GER Hill 0-6-0T 11/1923 02/09/1958  
39E   J68 GER Hill 0-6-0T 11/1923 07/12/1959  
40E   J68 GER Hill 0-6-0T 11/1923 18/08/1958