Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 548 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3474 Week
» 5212 Month
» 132655 Year
» 1798031 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/K19
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 12/1886
For 20 Steam locomotives
Class J66

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
285   J66 GER Holden 0-6-0T 02/1887 10/1939  
286   J66 GER Holden 0-6-0T 02/1887 09/1939  
287   J66 GER Holden 0-6-0T 03/1887 10/1936  
288   J66 GER Holden 0-6-0T 03/1887 19/04/1954  
289   J66 GER Holden 0-6-0T 03/1887 02/1951  
290   J66 GER Holden 0-6-0T 04/1887 28/01/1952  
291   J66 GER Holden 0-6-0T 04/1887 02/1939  
292   J66 GER Holden 0-6-0T 04/1887 10/1936  
293   J66 GER Holden 0-6-0T 05/1887 14/06/1954  
294   J66 GER Holden 0-6-0T 04/1887 07/1937  
295   J66 GER Holden 0-6-0T 05/1887 12/1938  
296   J66 GER Holden 0-6-0T 10/1887 24/11/1952  
297   J66 GER Holden 0-6-0T 06/1887 05/1939  
298   J66 GER Holden 0-6-0T 06/1887 07/1951  
299   J66 GER Holden 0-6-0T 09/1887 06/1937  
300   J66 GER Holden 0-6-0T 09/1887 04/1939  
301   J66 GER Holden 0-6-0T 09/1887 08/1939  
302   J66 GER Holden 0-6-0T 09/1887 05/1939  
303   J66 GER Holden 0-6-0T 09/1887 10/1936  
304   J66 GER Holden 0-6-0T 09/1887 05/1951