Manufacturer: Stratford Works
Builder | Stratford Works |
Order Date | 1921 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | N7 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | N7 | GER | Hill | 0-6-2T | 07/1921 | 27/07/1959 | ||
1003 | N7 | GER | Hill | 0-6-2T | 07/1921 | 27/07/1959 | ||
1004 | N7 | GER | Hill | 0-6-2T | 09/1921 | 10/08/1959 | ||
1005 | N7 | GER | Hill | 0-6-2T | 09/1921 | 06/10/1958 | ||
1006 | N7 | GER | Hill | 0-6-2T | 09/1921 | 11/08/1958 | ||
1007 | N7 | GER | Hill | 0-6-2T | 10/1921 | 22/07/1958 | ||
1008 | N7 | GER | Hill | 0-6-2T | 10/1921 | 11/08/1958 | ||
1009 | N7 | GER | Hill | 0-6-2T | 10/1921 | 28/04/1958 | ||
1010 | N7 | GER | Hill | 0-6-2T | 11/1921 | 01/01/1959 | ||
1011 | N7 | GER | Hill | 0-6-2T | 11/1921 | 24/11/1960 |