Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 34 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4661 Week
» 6399 Month
» 133842 Year
» 1799218 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/L47
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 02/1900
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class D14

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1890   D14 GER Holden 4-4-0 04/1900 25/06/1951  
1891   D14 GER Holden 4-4-0 04/1900 04/02/1952  
1892   D14 GER Holden 4-4-0 04/1900 12/02/1951  
1893   D14 GER Holden 4-4-0 05/1900 06/1948  
1894   D14 GER Holden 4-4-0 05/1900 19/11/1951  
1895   D14 GER Holden 4-4-0 06/1900 21/04/1952  
1896   D14 GER Holden 4-4-0 06/1900 21/04/1952  
1897   D14 GER Holden 4-4-0 06/1900 10/1950  
1898   D14 GER Holden 4-4-0 07/1900 22/09/1952  
1899   D14 GER Holden 4-4-0 07/1900 07/10/1957