Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 503 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3429 Week
» 5167 Month
» 132610 Year
» 1797986 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/L55
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 03/1903
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class D14

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1860   D14 GER Holden 4-4-0 05/1903 21/03/1955  
1861   D14 GER Holden 4-4-0 05/1903 12/11/1956  
1862   D14 GER Holden 4-4-0 05/1903 23/09/1957  
1863   D14 GER Holden 4-4-0 06/1903 11/11/1958  
1864   D14 GER Holden 4-4-0 06/1903 25/11/1957  
1865   D14 GER Holden 4-4-0 09/1903 25/07/1955  
1866   D14 GER Holden 4-4-0 09/1903 09/1945  
1867   D14 GER Holden 4-4-0 10/1903 28/04/1952  
1868   D14 GER Holden 4-4-0 10/1903 28/10/1957  
1869   D14 GER Holden 4-4-0 11/1903 24/08/1959