Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 587 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3513 Week
» 5251 Month
» 132694 Year
» 1798070 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/M51
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 02/1901
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class D14

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1880   D14 GER Holden 4-4-0 04/1901 17/12/1959  
1881   D14 GER Holden 4-4-0 05/1901 08/1950  
1882   D14 GER Holden 4-4-0 05/1901 03/11/1958  
1883   D14 GER Holden 4-4-0 05/1901 11/03/1957  
1884   D14 GER Holden 4-4-0 05/1901 01/04/1958  
1885   D14 GER Holden 4-4-0 05/1901 18/08/1957  
1886   D14 GER Holden 4-4-0 06/1901 28/09/1959  
1887   D14 GER Holden 4-4-0 06/1901 13/10/1958  
1888   D14 GER Holden 4-4-0 06/1901 01/01/1957  
1889   D14 GER Holden 4-4-0 06/1901 27/08/1951