Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 487 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3413 Week
» 5151 Month
» 132594 Year
» 1797970 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/M77
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 01/1914
For 6 Steam locomotives
Class B12

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1530   B12 GER Holden 4-6-0 11/1914 09/11/1959  
1531   B12 GER Holden 4-6-0 11/1914 11/1947  
1532   B12 GER Holden 4-6-0 12/1914 01/07/1953  
1533   B12 GER Holden 4-6-0 12/1914 03/11/1959  
1534   B12 GER Holden 4-6-0 02/1915 06/1945  
1535   B12 GER Holden 4-6-0 03/1915 11/12/1959