Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 565 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3491 Week
» 5229 Month
» 132672 Year
» 1798048 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/N33
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 02/1892
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class J67
Information Passenger

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
367   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 04/1894 02/11/1959  
368   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 04/1894 31/01/1955  
369   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 04/1894 03/02/1961  
370   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 05/1894 05/05/1958  
371   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 05/1894 21/04/1956  
372   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 05/1894 09/11/1953  
373   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 05/1894 11/02/1962  
374   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 06/1894 25/07/1961  
375   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 06/1894 21/06/1957  
376   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 06/1894 10/09/1961