Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 489 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3415 Week
» 5153 Month
» 132596 Year
» 1797972 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/P28
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 1891
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class J15

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
915   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 11/1891 10/12/1951  
916   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 11/1891 04/1937  
917   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 11/1891 03/1939  
918   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 11/1891 11/1949  
919   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 12/1891 06/1936  
920   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 12/1891 06/02/1948  
921   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 12/1891 15/04/1948  
922   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 12/1891 24/10/1949  
923   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 12/1891 10/1934  
924   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 12/1891 25/11/1950