Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 602 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3528 Week
» 5266 Month
» 132709 Year
» 1798085 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/P29
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 12/1891
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class J67
Information Passenger

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
347   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 02/1892 16/06/1959  
348   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 02/1892 14/12/1953  
349   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 03/1892 03/10/1960  
350   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 03/1892 20/06/1958  
351   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 03/1892 28/10/1959  
352   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 03/1892 18/08/1958  
353   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 03/1892 14/02/1961  
354   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 03/1892 08/10/1955  
335   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 03/1892 16/12/1958  
356   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 03/1892 14/07/1953