Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 602 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3528 Week
» 5266 Month
» 132709 Year
» 1798085 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/P52
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 09/1901
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class J16

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1180   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 11/1901 11/01/1960  
1181   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 11/1901 21/04/1959  
1182   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 11/1901 11/02/1962  
1183   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 11/1901 04/01/1960  
1184   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 11/1901 05/05/1958  
1185   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 12/1901 05/05/1958  
1186   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 12/1901 17/03/1960  
1187   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 12/1901 28/01/1957  
1188   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 12/1901 17/04/1959  
1189   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 02/1902 22/08/1960