Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 33 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4660 Week
» 6398 Month
» 133841 Year
» 1799217 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/P54
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 09/1902
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class J16

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1200   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 11/1902 11/1944  
1201   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 12/1902 10/02/1960  
1202   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 12/1902 10/01/1955  
1203   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 12/1902 21/04/1959  
1204   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 12/1902 10/09/1961  
1205   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 01/1903 17/03/1960  
1206   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 01/1903 16/03/1961  
1207   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 02/1903 22/04/1959  
1208   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 02/1903 04/01/1960  
1209   J16 GER Holden 0-6-0 02/1903 16/11/1959