Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 32 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4659 Week
» 6397 Month
» 133840 Year
» 1799216 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/P55
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 1903
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class F4

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
140   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 06/1903 03/1932  
141   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 06/1903 29/12/1955  
142   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 06/1903 20/12/1956  
143   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 06/1903 23/11/1955  
144   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 06/1903 21/11/1955  
145   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 07/1903 21/04/1958  
146   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 07/1903 01/1930  
147   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 07/1903 04/11/1957  
148   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 08/1903 08/1931  
149   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 08/1903 05/1931