Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 27 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4654 Week
» 6392 Month
» 133835 Year
» 1799211 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/P67
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 05/1910
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class D15

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1800   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 07/1910 17/04/1950  
1801   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 07/1910 01/04/1958  
1802   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 08/1910 07/10/1957  
1803   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 08/1910 03/1949  
1804   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 08/1910 11/1946  
1805   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 09/1910 28/10/1957  
1806   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 09/1910 04/01/1960  
1807   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 10/1910 12/05/1952  
1808   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 10/1910 15/09/1958  
1809   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 11/1910 12/06/1948