Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 588 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3514 Week
» 5252 Month
» 132695 Year
» 1798071 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/R24
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 01/1890
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class J67
Information Passenger

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
327   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 03/1890 07/05/1958  
328   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 03/1890 03/06/1958  
329   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 03/1890 22/06/1956  
330   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 03/1890 10/1954  
331   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 03/1890 08/04/1958  
332   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 04/1890 07/05/1958  
333   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 04/1890 09/1939  
334   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 04/1890 14/05/1956  
335   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 04/1890 19/09/1960  
336   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 04/1890 03/08/1959