Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 494 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3420 Week
» 5158 Month
» 132601 Year
» 1797977 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/R29
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 02/1892
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class J67
Information Passenger

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
357   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 04/1892 30/08/1954  
358   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 04/1892 20/08/1959  
359   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 04/1892 21/02/1958  
360   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 04/1892 20/06/1958  
361   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 04/1892 10/09/1961  
362   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 04/1892 10/1940  
363   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 05/1892 16/01/1956  
364   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 05/1892 01/1931  
365   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 05/1892 12/08/1958  
366   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 05/1892 16/09/1962