Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 27 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4654 Week
» 6392 Month
» 133835 Year
» 1799211 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/R50
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 04/1901
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class J67
Information Passenger

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
160   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 06/1901 05/05/1958  
161   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 06/1901 15/10/1958  
162   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 06/1901 16/09/1962  
163   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 06/1901 07/01/1957  
164   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 06/1901 25/07/1955  
165   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 07/1901 26/06/1961  
166   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 07/1901 17/09/1961  
167   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 07/1901 10/1940  
168   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 08/1901 10/1940  
169   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 08/1901 27/11/1958