Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 588 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3514 Week
» 5252 Month
» 132695 Year
» 1798071 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/R75
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 01/1914
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class B12

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1520   B12 GER Holden 4-6-0 04/1914 24/06/1957  
1521   B12 GER Holden 4-6-0 04/1914 15/07/1952  
1522   B12 GER Holden 4-6-0 04/1914 08/1947  
1523   B12 GER Holden 4-6-0 05/1914 21/03/1955  
1524   B12 GER Holden 4-6-0 05/1914 05/11/1953  
1525   B12 GER Holden 4-6-0 06/1914 06/08/1951  
1526   B12 GER Holden 4-6-0 06/1914 26/10/1951  
1527   B12 GER Holden 4-6-0 08/1914 09/1947  
1528   B12 GER Holden 4-6-0 08/1914 01/07/1953  
1529   B12 GER Holden 4-6-0 09/1914 03/02/1950