Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 599 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3525 Week
» 5263 Month
» 132706 Year
» 1798082 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/S24
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 02/1890
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class J67
Information Passenger

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
337   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 04/1890 16/09/1962  
338   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 05/1890 13/01/1961  
339   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 05/1890 16/08/1960  
340   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 05/1890 06/02/1961  
341   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 05/1890 03/01/1957  
342   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 05/1890 23/01/1956  
343   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 05/1890 11/11/1953  
344   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 05/1890 10/1940  
345   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 05/1890 06/06/1960  
346   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 05/1890 02/02/1961