Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 542 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3468 Week
» 5206 Month
» 132649 Year
» 1798025 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/S28
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 1891
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class J15

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
925   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 12/1891 11/1949  
926   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 12/1891 05/1949  
927   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 12/1891 12/1949  
928   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 12/1891 20/08/1956  
929   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 12/1891 12/03/1948  
930   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 12/1891 01/1935  
931   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 01/1892 02/1950  
932   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 01/1892 01/08/1962  
933   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 01/1892 03/1936  
934   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 01/1892 17/03/1948