Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 27 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4654 Week
» 6392 Month
» 133835 Year
» 1799211 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/S48
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 04/1900
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class J67
Information Passenger

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
189   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 06/1900 06/11/1959  
190   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 07/1900 11/10/1955  
191   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 07/1900 11/05/1957  
192   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 07/1900 02/11/1959  
193   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 07/1900 16/09/1962  
194   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 07/1900 01/10/1959  
195   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 07/1900 28/10/1959  
196   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 08/1900 05/03/1958  
197   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 08/1900 10/1940  
198   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 08/1900 04/07/1958