Manufacturer: Stratford Works
Builder | Stratford Works |
Order Date | 1900 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | E4 |
Information | Not delivered until 1902 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1250 | E4 | GER | Holden | 2-4-0 | 06/1902 | 18/06/1956 | ||
1251 | E4 | GER | Holden | 2-4-0 | 06/1902 | 28/02/1955 | ||
1252 | E4 | GER | Holden | 2-4-0 | 06/1902 | 22/08/1955 | ||
1253 | E4 | GER | Holden | 2-4-0 | 06/1902 | 01/1935 | ||
1254 | E4 | GER | Holden | 2-4-0 | 06/1902 | 07/03/1955 | ||
1255 | E4 | GER | Holden | 2-4-0 | 07/1902 | 08/1935 | ||
1256 | E4 | GER | Holden | 2-4-0 | 07/1902 | 10/1931 | ||
1257 | E4 | GER | Holden | 2-4-0 | 07/1902 | 13/05/1957 | ||
1258 | E4 | GER | Holden | 2-4-0 | 08/1902 | 06/1937 | ||
1259 | E4 | GER | Holden | 2-4-0 | 08/1902 | 17/03/1958 |