Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 33 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4660 Week
» 6398 Month
» 133841 Year
» 1799217 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/S56
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 03/1904
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class J69
Information Passenger

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
51   J69 GER Holden 0-6-0T 05/1904 14/07/1958  
52   J69 GER Holden 0-6-0T 05/1904 18/08/1958  
53   J69 GER Holden 0-6-0T 05/1904 30/10/1961  
54   J69 GER Holden 0-6-0T 05/1904 10/1940  
55   J69 GER Holden 0-6-0T 05/1904 16/09/1962  
56   J69 GER Holden 0-6-0T 06/1904 10/1940  
57   J69 GER Holden 0-6-0T 06/1904 14/02/1961  
58   J69 GER Holden 0-6-0T 06/1904 10/1940  
59   J69 GER Holden 0-6-0T 06/1904 01/01/1959  
60   J69 GER Holden 0-6-0T 06/1904 03/05/1962