Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 531 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3457 Week
» 5195 Month
» 132638 Year
» 1798014 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/S59
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 11/1905
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class J17

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1220   J17 GER Holden 0-6-0 01/1906 22/04/1960  
1221   J17 GER Holden 0-6-0 01/1906 11/02/1958  
1222   J17 GER Holden 0-6-0 01/1906 02/12/1957  
1223   J17 GER Holden 0-6-0 01/1906 08/10/1958  
1224   J17 GER Holden 0-6-0 01/1906 19/04/1955  
1225   J17 GER Holden 0-6-0 02/1906 04/02/1958  
1226   J17 GER Holden 0-6-0 02/1906 16/09/1962  
1227   J17 GER Holden 0-6-0 02/1906 11/02/1962  
1228   J17 GER Holden 0-6-0 03/1906 05/03/1962  
1229   J17 GER Holden 0-6-0 03/1906 29/11/1954