Manufacturer: Stratford Works
Builder | Stratford Works |
Order Date | 11/1905 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | J17 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1220 | J17 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0 | 01/1906 | 22/04/1960 | ||
1221 | J17 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0 | 01/1906 | 11/02/1958 | ||
1222 | J17 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0 | 01/1906 | 02/12/1957 | ||
1223 | J17 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0 | 01/1906 | 08/10/1958 | ||
1224 | J17 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0 | 01/1906 | 19/04/1955 | ||
1225 | J17 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0 | 02/1906 | 04/02/1958 | ||
1226 | J17 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0 | 02/1906 | 16/09/1962 | ||
1227 | J17 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0 | 02/1906 | 11/02/1962 | ||
1228 | J17 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0 | 03/1906 | 05/03/1962 | ||
1229 | J17 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0 | 03/1906 | 29/11/1954 |