Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 256 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 2421 Week
» 2421 Month
» 69283 Year
» 1734659 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/S64
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 1908
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class F4

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
170   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 08/1908 19/09/1955  
171   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 09/1908 04/1948  
172   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 09/1908 24/04/1948  
173   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 09/1908 24/04/1948  
174   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 09/1908 24/04/1948  
175   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 10/1908 01/08/1951  
176   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 10/1908 04/1943  
177   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 10/1908 24/04/1948  
178   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 10/1908 24/04/1948  
179   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 11/1908 17/12/1956