Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 533 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3459 Week
» 5197 Month
» 132640 Year
» 1798016 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/S69
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 01/1911
For 5 Steam locomotives
Class B12

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1500   B12 GER Holden 4-6-0 12/1911 23/06/1948  
1501   B12 GER Holden 4-6-0 02/1912 20/05/1953  
1502   B12 GER Holden 4-6-0 02/1912 30/04/1954  
1503   B12 GER Holden 4-6-0 03/1912 20/05/1951  
1504   B12 GER Holden 4-6-0 05/1912 16/06/1950