Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 33 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4660 Week
» 6398 Month
» 133841 Year
» 1799217 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/T67
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 08/1910
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class J17

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1230   J17 GER Holden 0-6-0 10/1910 16/11/1959  
1231   J17 GER Holden 0-6-0 11/1910 25/04/1962  
1232   J17 GER Holden 0-6-0 11/1910 16/09/1962  
1233   J17 GER Holden 0-6-0 11/1910 11/02/1962  
1234   J17 GER Holden 0-6-0 11/1910 02/02/1960  
1235   J17 GER Holden 0-6-0 11/1910 01/11/1954  
1236   J17 GER Holden 0-6-0 12/1910 17/04/1962  
1237   J17 GER Holden 0-6-0 12/1910 01/12/1958  
1238   J17 GER Holden 0-6-0 01/1911 29/05/1961  
1239   J17 GER Holden 0-6-0 01/1911 02/01/1961