Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 581 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3507 Week
» 5245 Month
» 132688 Year
» 1798064 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/T77
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 1916
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class J19

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1140   J19 GER Hill 0-6-0 08/1916 11/10/1960  
1141   J19 GER Hill 0-6-0 08/1916 01/01/1959  
1142   J19 GER Hill 0-6-0 08/1916 17/01/1961  
1143   J19 GER Hill 0-6-0 09/1916 13/01/1961  
1144   J19 GER Hill 0-6-0 10/1916 25/01/1960  
1145   J19 GER Hill 0-6-0 11/1916 03/08/1961  
1146   J19 GER Hill 0-6-0 11/1916 09/05/1960  
1147   J19 GER Hill 0-6-0 11/1916 16/09/1962  
1148   J19 GER Hill 0-6-0 12/1916 09/11/1959  
1149   J19 GER Hill 0-6-0 01/1917 01/04/1960