Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 592 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3518 Week
» 5256 Month
» 132699 Year
» 1798075 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/X28
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 1892
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class J15

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
936   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 08/1892 04/1937  
937   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 08/1892 04/07/1955  
938   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 08/1892 10/1934  
939   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 08/1892 02/1936  
940   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 08/1892 25/11/1950  
941   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 08/1892 18/12/1959  
942   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 09/1892 01/10/1956  
943   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 09/1892 21/05/1951  
944   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 09/1892 02/1935  
945   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 11/1892 25/11/1950